WATERBEACH MILITARY HERITAGE MUSEUM

Charity Number: 1164795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Waterbeach Military Heritage Museum holds artifacts, photographs, paper ephemera largely of Waterbeach RAF Station and Barracks from 1938 to 2013 of RAF activities and 39 Engineer Regiment, occupations. Their units and personnel. Acts as a historical resource for the public and those who lived and served in the forces and/or as civilians during those years also for researchers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,182
Total expenditure: £3,077

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • WMHM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ADRIAN JAMES WRIGHT Chair 27 October 2013
WATERBEACH VILLAGE SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, WATERBEACH
Received: On time
Leslie Moss Trustee 10 February 2022
None on record
Peter GROVES RAF Retd. Trustee 19 October 2017
None on record
Michael J BARRY MM. RE Rtd Trustee 19 October 2017
None on record
David B Higgins RE Retd. Trustee 18 May 2017
None on record
ALAN KENNETH SHIPP Trustee 27 October 2013
WATERBEACH ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Lt.Col. Retd. DAVID MARTIN ADAMSON RE Retd. Trustee 27 October 2013
None on record
Dr ROBERT JOHN STRIPE FREEMAN Trustee 27 October 2013
None on record
Clive Dickerson HILL Trustee 27 October 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.27k £3.00k £1.48k £3.34k £6.18k
Total expenditure £1.66k £3.09k £380 £1.14k £3.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.46k N/A N/A £2.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 August 2024 211 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 August 2024 211 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Chairman Waterbeach Military Heritage Museum
Building No.3 Waterbeach Barracks
Denny End Road
WATERBEACH
Cambridge
CB25 9PA
Phone:
01223861846