Financial history ALFORD FOCAL POINT

Charity Number: 1162899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £39.34k £37.61k £5.95k £5.44k £5.99k
Total expenditure £10.34k £8.96k £4.31k £3.46k £3.26k
Income from government contracts £5.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £33.72k £37.37k £5.17k £5.17k £5.17k