Financial history CROYDON VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 1165086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £557.70k £532.06k £512.41k £733.65k £747.90k
Total expenditure £515.15k £565.41k £852.85k £734.79k £815.68k
Income from government contracts N/A £39.74k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £7.20k £49.84k £50.60k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £224.04k £66.08k £69.99k £58.20k £19.30k
Income - Other trading activities £72.32k £43.79k £67.81k £95.20k £115.29k
Income - Charitable activities £246.02k £422.17k £374.59k £570.90k £606.50k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £30 £15 £22 £692 £1.60k
Income - Other £15.29k £0 £0 £8.65k £5.22k
Income - Legacies £0 £49.84k £1.00k £6.05k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £479.75k £557.87k £843.22k £675.18k £743.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.40k £7.54k £9.63k £59.61k £72.51k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £16.09k £0 £24.82k £29.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0