BRAIN CIRCLE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education in brain sciences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 07 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MURIEL RAYMONDE SALEM | Chair | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID ROTHENBERG | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £290.65k | £200.00k | £83.03k | £418.74k | £51.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £610.78k | £205.91k | £84.34k | £388.31k | £104.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BRAIN SCIENCES IN PARTICULAR BY: (I) PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND MATERIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO AND FOR THE CARRYING ON OF THE BRAIN AND NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH AT THE EDMOND AND LILY SAFRA CENTER FOR BRAIN SCIENCES AT THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM (ELSC) (INCLUDING FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT FOR STUDENTS AND SCIENTISTS ENGAGED IN SUCH RESEARCH AND ALSO THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS FOR STUDENTS) AND AT ANY NON-PROFIT MAKING EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION OF ACADEMIC STANDING WITH WHICH THE ELSC SHALL AT ANY TIME BE AMALGAMATED OR ASSOCIATED AND AT ANY OTHER SUCH INSTITUTION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; AND (II) DEVELOPING SCIENTIFIC COLLABORATION BETWEEN ELSC AND OTHER SCIENTIFIC INSTITUTIONS IN BRITAIN OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD CONDUCTING BRAIN AND NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
213 ALBANY STREET
LONDON
NW1 4AB
- Phone:
- +44 20 7813 0916
- Email:
- office@braincircle.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window