Financial history THE ROBERT POULTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165526
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/05/2019 04/05/2020 04/05/2021 04/05/2022 04/05/2023
Total gross income £10.14k £9.09k £624 £5.85k £8.34k
Total expenditure £9.90k £7.57k £1.27k £5.83k £8.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A