Financial history DEAN FOREST LOCOMOTIVE GROUP

Charity number: 1164847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.88k £75.58k £79.82k £108.27k £111.75k
Total expenditure £55.09k £61.70k £95.46k £101.91k £80.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A