HOLBROOKS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community centre building for the use of local residents groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 02 December 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Clifford | Chair | 05 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Virumati Kansara | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Pemberton | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kim Rawlings | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Simon Oakes | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.16k | £21.29k | £54.69k | £45.72k | £109.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.41k | £16.95k | £43.77k | £50.36k | £71.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 March 2021 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APRIL 1972 AS AMENDED 9 NOVEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HOLBROOKS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, REGLIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGAISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURETIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
HOLBROOK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Centre
John Shelton Drive
COVENTRY
CV6 4PE
- Phone:
- 02476665621
- Email:
- hca@holbrookscommunity.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window