THE BRITISH HEDGEHOG PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are dedicated to helping & protecting native UK hedgehogs. Through campaigns, advocacy & educational projects we work to raise awareness of practical steps we can all take to help reverse the decline of hedgehogs in the wild, improve their welfare & safeguard the future of this much-loved animal. We fund research that provides important new insights into the conservation & welfare of hedgehogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£611,112
Donations and legacies | £517.01k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £94.10k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£510,593
Raising funds | £26.55k | |
Charitable activities | £484.04k | |
Other | £0 |
£94,102 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £26.55k | |
Charitable expenditure | £484.04k | |
Retained for future use | £100.52k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £26.55k | |
Charitable expenditure | £484.04k | |
Retained for future use | £194.62k |
People

8 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 November 2015: Standard registration
- 03 March 2025: Funds received from 517441 SOUTH YORKSHIRE ANIMAL RESCUE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Hampstead | Chair | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Noelle Edinborough | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Mark Thomas | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lachlan Thomas Rurlander | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew James Pound | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Kay Verret | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nigel James Reeve | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAY ELIZABETH BULLEN | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £674.83k | £505.73k | £448.37k | £908.92k | £611.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £393.41k | £345.02k | £465.08k | £477.58k | £510.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £665.91k | £503.74k | N/A | £876.63k | £517.01k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.91k | £1.99k | N/A | £32.29k | £94.10k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £366.35k | £237.80k | N/A | £597.41k | £206.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £351.64k | £310.17k | N/A | £452.59k | £484.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £41.77k | £34.85k | N/A | £23.81k | £26.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.25k | £11.49k | N/A | £22.16k | £14.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £162.51k | £148.77k | N/A | £218.75k | £191.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £1.18k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £189.48k | £190.19k | N/A | £189.80k | £189.65k | |
|
Long-term investments | £15.00k | £15.00k | N/A | £15.00k | £15.00k | |
|
Other assets | £2.11m | £2.27m | N/A | £2.69m | £2.79m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £18.23k | £20.97k | N/A | £30.38k | £21.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/11/2015 as amended on 18 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
To promote the conservation and welfare of the Western European hedgehog (Erinaceus europaeus) as a wild species in the British Isles and safeguard its future for the benefit of the public. In furtherance of the above, the charity may: 1. Promote the conservation of hedgehogs and their habitats, by means of campaigns, advocacy and educational projects that raise awareness of the practical steps needed to help reverse the decline of hedgehogs and improve their welfare. 2. Provide advocacy and an expert source of information and advice to the public, businesses, governmental and other organisations regarding the conservation, ecology, behaviour and welfare of hedgehogs. 3. Promote knowledge of and the understanding of current laws for the protection and welfare of native hedgehogs in the British Isles and seek further legal protection as necessary. 4. Identify and provide funding for research (which shall be published) that is of benefit to the Western European hedgehog. 5. Provide information and support educational projects, especially for the younger generation, to promote understanding, appreciation, respect and a humane attitude to hedgehogs and other wildlife.
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Hedgehog Preservation
Society
Hedgehog House
9 Rouse-Boughton Terrace
Clee Hill
Ludlow
- Phone:
- 01584890801
- Email:
- info@britishhedgehogs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window