SHREWSBURY CHRISTIAN CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of support to homeless and vulnerable people in Shrewsbury
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £56,706 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Shropshire
Governance
- The Shrewsbury Ark (Working name)
- SHREWSBURY CHRISTIAN CENTRE ASSOCIATION (CIO) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Jane Bell | Chair | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jenkins | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Jill Robinson | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Steven Henry Haffenden | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Norman Davies | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Anna Louise Waddington-Feather | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Shaw | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Plomer Somervaille CBE RN | Trustee | 20 December 2003 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287.74k | £330.05k | £301.86k | £312.84k | £392.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.68k | £215.05k | £234.18k | £300.95k | £329.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.85k | £46.28k | £40.00k | £73.86k | £56.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 08 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF (I)A CARE CENTRE FOR THE NEEDY; (II)WHEN APPROPRIATE, ADDITIONAL DAY AND NIGHT FACILITIES WITH THE AIM OF OFFERING PRACTICAL CHRISTIAN CONCERN FOR THE NEEDY; (III)A NIGHT SHELTER FOR HOMELESS PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Shrewsbury Ark
32 Castle Foregate
SHREWSBURY
SY1 2EH
- Phone:
- 01743874975
- Email:
- ark@shrewsburyark.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window