SAFE SPACE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stay and Play sessions for children with additional needs. Sessions for any family of a child (under 18) to come along with their siblings. Operate out of The Stokes, Little Stoke ( next to Little Stoke Primary) No diagnosis required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- Cardiff
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.51k | £12.44k | £8.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.66k | £11.02k | £7.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 08 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 08 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 27 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 27 October 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PROVIDING RELIEF TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS IN THE BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE AREAS AS WELL AS THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A FACILITY FOR STAY AND PLAY SESSIONS (FOR PLAY; ARTS AND CRAFTS; GAMES AS WELL AS OCCASIONAL SPECIAL EVENTS) FOR THEIR BENEFIT. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE. ‘CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE’ MEANS ANYONE WHO IS OF THE AGE OF 17 OR UNDER. ‘ADDITIONAL NEEDS’ COVERS DIAGNOSED AND UNDIAGNOSED CONDITIONS AND DISABILITIES (AS DEFINED UNDER THE EQUALITIES ACT 2010). ‘FAMILIES’ INCLUDE BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PARENTS; CARERS; LEGAL GUARDIANS; SIBLINGS; PERSONAL ASSISTANCES ETC.
Area of benefit
REGIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window