WORCESTER NEWS AND EQUIPMENT SERVICE FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 506808
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides a weekly 90 minute tape cassette of local news to blind and partially sighted people in and around Worcester, all completely free of cost. We also provide a talking book literary service all free. Tape players are provided free on request.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018

Total income: £3,669
Total expenditure: £5,169

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 1977: Standard registration
  • 24 September 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 24 September 2020: Funds transferred to 1180242 WORCESTER NEWS AND EQUIPMENT SERVICES FOR THE BLIN...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
  • WORCESTER TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £8.12k £792 £1.98k £3.23k £3.67k
Total expenditure £5.55k £9.46k £7.18k £15.09k £5.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required