Financial history THE MANCHESTER HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 506823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £536.94k £1.15m £675.03k £560.47k £569.65k
Total expenditure £434.05k £496.09k £356.35k £448.96k £476.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £264.11k £617.49k £240.96k £168.68k £220.97k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £174.13k £422.00k £309.50k £260.65k £214.18k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £83.76k £99.06k £124.57k £131.13k £134.49k
Income - Other £14.95k £6.55k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £617.49k £240.96k £168.68k £220.97k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £416.55k £470.04k £329.08k £410.93k £443.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.49k £22.94k £23.91k £33.92k £26.77k
Expenditure - Governance £5.83k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £410.72k £470.04k £329.08k £410.93k £443.73k
Expenditure - Investment management £17.49k £22.94k £23.91k £33.92k £26.77k
Expenditure - Other £0 £3.12k £3.36k £4.11k £5.57k