THE WELSH ASSOCIATION OF YOUTH CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Youth Cymru is to research, identify and respond to the needs of young people by developing and delivering programmes that contribute to their lifelong learning in an educational but essentially informal context.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £95,958 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 13 October 2015: Standard registration
- 03 March 2016: Funds received from 524480 YOUTH CYMRU
- YOUTH CYMRU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA LOUISE CHIVERS | Chair | 14 March 2015 |
|
|||||||
Vasiliki Kolovou | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Cullen | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gareth John Jones | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Ryan | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Frost | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ieuan Bater | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Nirushan Sudarsan | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Chris Hole | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
KEITH REGINALD COATES | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|||||||
ANTHONY RODERIC HILL | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £327.86k | £411.02k | £312.44k | £306.82k | £458.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £364.49k | £357.32k | £358.09k | £351.63k | £446.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £9.00k | N/A | £15.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £101.67k | £102.65k | £103.72k | £90.49k | £95.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/09/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WALES, ALONE OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHERS, TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, IN ORDER THAT THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Youth Cymru
Unit D
Upper Boat Trading Estate
PONTYPRIDD
CF37 5BP
- Phone:
- 01443827840
- Email:
- mailbox@youthcymru.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window