Financial history THE NATIONAL LAND BASED COLLEGE

Charity number: 1164698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £52.42k £70.40k £49.00k £48.27k £63.32k
Total expenditure £57.13k £57.88k £57.34k £56.94k £78.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A