Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF READING MATINS' CHARITY

Charity number: 1163723
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.67k £33.38k £15.57k £39.02k £72.95k
Total expenditure £14.75k £32.60k £20.12k £19.53k £90.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A