Trustees OUR MOON EDUCATION

Charity number: 1165083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Bowen Chair 07 February 2020
None on record
Dhruv Sarda Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Krishan Tailor Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
Funmi Akinluyi Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
Kim Polley Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
Chanda Singoyi Trustee 27 February 2023
None on record
Vanessa Strauss Trustee 07 February 2020
None on record
Alan Leale-Green Trustee 07 January 2016
THE FRIENDS OF TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND RUSTHALL COMMONS
Received: On time
HELEN LEALE-GREEN BA, ACMA Trustee 07 January 2016
None on record