SIDLESHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are to establish and run a village hall and to promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Parish of Sidlesham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £17,500 from 18 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 November 2015: CIO registration
- SCA (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Riach John Ryder | Chair | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jane Wade Kate | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Tupper | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Charles Edwards Mr | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Alford Devonshire | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bill Martin | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Devonshire | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Corina June Hall | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|||||
MR Norman Robson | Trustee | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.71k | £1.91k | £28.86k | £10.35k | £20.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.85k | £2.03k | £3.34k | £22.26k | £19.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 180 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SIDLESHAM ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND EDUCATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCALLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Bremere Lane
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
PO20 7BN
- Phone:
- 01243641533
- Email:
- richardcorina@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window