THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, BEDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES INCLUDING SERVICES FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £8,179 from 3 government grant(s)
People

23 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
Governance
- 16 November 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARK'S CHURCH COMMUNITY CENTRE, BEDFORD (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Charles Royden | Chair | 16 November 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr Timothy John Wilkes | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Diana Jean Johnson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Barry Southam | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
LYNNE SEYMOUR | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
LAURA FARTHING | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
MICHAEL JOHN COOPER | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Jean Elizabeth Kirk | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Alan Kirk | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Janet Warren | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Michael John Warren | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MARION PATRICIA PRIOR | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH APPLETON | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||
REV DR GRAHAM ROBERT CAPPLEMAN | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
WENDY CLARE WATERS | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JANET ELIZABETH ROSE IBBERSON | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||
AVRIL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||
IAN FARTHING | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||
VINCENT HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||
ELIZABETH RUTH BEAN | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MORAG-ANN STEWART BED MED | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JANET ROSEMARY DAY | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
JAMES WILLIAMS | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £364.89k | £322.24k | £339.47k | £316.02k | £432.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £336.77k | £325.95k | £299.50k | £319.08k | £410.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.23k | £25.94k | £2.42k | £8.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 July 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 July 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARKS CHURCH & COMMUNITY CENTRE
CALDER RISE
BEDFORD
MK41 7UY
- Phone:
- 07836784051
- Email:
- office@thisischurch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window