THE FRIDESWIDE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance musical education and the Christian religion for the public benefit by promoting opportunities for girl choristers aged between 7 and 14 to sing within the Anglican liturgy in acts of public worship and in secular public performances in Oxford college chapels and elsewhere, in particular by supporting a girls' choir in Oxford called 'Frideswide Voices'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 14 January 2016: Standard registration
- 09 January 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 January 2019: Re-registered
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Very Revd Professor Sarah Rosamund Irvine Foot | Chair | 26 November 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Dr Jonathan Allen Arnold | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Patrick Charles Craig | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
ASSOCIATE PROFESSOR EDWIN JOHN FLETCHER SIMPSON | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|||||||||
MR PEGRAM HARRISON | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
WILLIAM JENSEN | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.51k | £7.13k | £1.03k | £100 | £110 | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.66k | £320 | £186 | £96 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 January 2025 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 October 2023 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 February 2023 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 February 2023 | 626 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 February 2023 | 991 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 NOV 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE MUSICAL EDUCATION AND THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR GIRL CHORISTERS AGED BETWEEN 7 AND 14 TO SING WITHIN THE ANGLICAN LITURGY IN ACTS OF PUBLIC WORSHIP AND IN SECULAR PUBLIC PERFORMANCES IN OXFORD COLLEGE CHAPELS AND ELSEWHERE, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING A GIRLS' CHOIR IN OXFORD CALLED "FRIDESWIDE VOICES".
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COTTAGE
THE RIDINGS
STONESFIELD
WITNEY
OX29 8EB
- Phone:
- 07966147509
- Email:
- frideswidevoices@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window