THE HUNGER PROJECT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hunger Project is a strategic organisation and global movement whose mission is to end hunger and poverty by pioneering sustainable, grassroots, women-centred strategies and advocating for their widespread adoption throughout the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bangladesh
- Benin
- Burkina Faso
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- India
- Malawi
- Mexico
- Mozambique
- Peru
- Senegal
- Uganda
Governance
- 14 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Claire George | Trustee | 05 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Robert James Fernandez | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Harbard | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Joanna Claire Elliott | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Mandakini Lakhani | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|||||
MONIQUE MARIEKE SURRIDGE | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.70k | £132.99k | £147.56k | £173.48k | £468.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.51k | £133.14k | £61.25k | £186.85k | £302.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.80k | £27.48k | £9.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 DEC 2015 as amended on 26 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELEVANT TO WORLD HUNGER AND STARVATION. 2. TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH WHOSE PUBLISHED RESULTS ARE LIKELY TO BE OF IN RELIEVING POVERTY AND HUNGER IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD. 3. TO ASSIST IN THE ERADICATION OF WORLD HUNGER AND STARVATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE IN NEED AND WHO ARE HUNGRY AND STARVING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 02039210216
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window