Financial history CHESTERFIELD CHURCH OF THE CROOKED SPIRE FUND

Charity Number: 506977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £12.55k £4.12k £0 £27.38k £330
Total expenditure £1.64k £163.35k £21.50k £6.16k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A