BUTTERFLIES - HAVEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of children and young person's affected by the complex Autism Spectrum (with or without diagnosis) or with a development delay, by the provision of support, facilities and services for them and their families. This service is provided to families from Bath an North East Somerset, Bristol, South Gloucestershire, North Somerset, Somerset and Wiltshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 20 July 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Callum Lee | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gwenna Ewing | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Barton | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Purkiss | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Christine Jorgensen | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matt Hunt | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN INKER | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.66k | £20.68k | £20.20k | £24.85k | £78.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.65k | £13.78k | £19.95k | £20.84k | £29.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £900 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSON'S AFFECTED BY THE COMPLEX AUTISM SPECTRUM (WITH OR WITHOUT DIAGNOSIS) OR WITH A DEVELOPMENT DELAY, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES. THIS SERVICE IS PROVIDED TO FAMILIES FROM BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET, BRISTOL, SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE, NORTH SOMERSET, SOMERSET AND WILTSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Butterflies-Haven
20 Temple Street
Keynsham
BRISTOL
BS31 1EH
- Phone:
- 07595089287
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window