Financial history WARRINGTON MUSEUM OF FREEMASONRY

Charity number: 1165077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £7.10k £4.18k £5.54k £4.73k £4.86k
Total expenditure £7.11k £1.99k £3.99k £8.01k £5.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A