Financial history THE SATURDAY CLUB TRUST

Charity number: 1165362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.12m £659.43k £655.46k £954.76k £1.61m
Total expenditure £685.19k £568.35k £874.14k £1.08m £1.61m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £480.00k £480.00k £500.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.11m £659.43k £33.96k £954.76k £1.60m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.55k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £10.96k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £685.19k £568.35k £850.21k £1.08m £1.59m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £23.93k £0 £19.95k
Expenditure - Governance £8.70k £4.74k £4.95k £0 £14.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0