Financial history THE GALTRES CENTRE CHARITY

Charity number: 1167301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £351.18k £145.65k £229.96k £275.10k £309.27k
Total expenditure £334.80k £228.32k £252.71k £284.68k £365.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.85k £92.76k N/A £47.95k £53.26k