SAFER TOURISM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's aim is to reduce the number of preventable deaths, injuries and illnesses occurring to British tourists travelling abroad. We work with the travel industry to improve health and safety for travellers, and we raise awareness of risk amongst the travelling public so that people can help to keep themselves safe and well when they are on holiday.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 August 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Ailles | Chair | 30 January 2017 |
|
|||||||
Anne Allis-Hill | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Andrew Carter | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Colin James Parselle | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Edward Deason | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Arthur GORDON LISHMAN | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|||||||
Hans Bernard Lagerweij | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Lesley Russell | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
SHARON LORRAINE WOOD | Trustee | 26 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.63k | £54.37k | £23.87k | £6.96k | £37.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.77k | £87.98k | £91.49k | £91.26k | £106.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.49k | £18.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF PERSONS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, WITH REGARD TO THE RISKS ASSOCIATED WITH TRAVEL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Safer Tourism Foundation
Astolat
Coniers Way
GUILDFORD
GU4 7HL
- Phone:
- 07773716887
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window