THE READING LIST FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We generate and provide ?250 Scholarships to students from lower-income households in England about to start university. The Scholarship pays for all or nearly all of their reading list (textbooks) in the first year or study. This gives them some financial as well as emotional breathing space, as well as a welcome addition to their CV.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 December 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN TERRY | Chair | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Catling | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Sadler-Smith | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Abidemi Bechem Adesuyi | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
EMILY MACAULAY | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Carmel Lawless | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.44k | £20.35k | £102.37k | £77.85k | £39.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.18k | £66.47k | £68.22k | £80.94k | £82.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF UNDERGRADUATE STUDENTS FROM LOWER INCOME HOUSEHOLDS, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN ENGLAND, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH FINANCIAL SCHOLARSHIPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 EARL RICHARDS ROAD NORTH
EXETER
EX2 6AQ
- Phone:
- 07947507847
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window