SANDWELL CHURCHES LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCL equips churches to connect with their local communities and take action to reduce homelessness, food poverty, financial exclusion and social isolation by: facilitating an anti-poverty movement; developing creative responses to poverty; enabling strong partnerships; encouraging people of faith to listen to their communities and respond as part of their Christian discipleship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £16,955 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sandwell
Governance
- 09 May 2016: CIO registration
- SCL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Mary Farley | Chair | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Oniyide Oludayomi | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Trevor Palfreyman | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bev Thomas | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev JON PHILIP GRANT | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|||||
HAZEL MARGARET BLOXHAM | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.50k | £52.48k | £28.33k | £69.70k | £128.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.55k | £28.98k | £36.69k | £75.09k | £74.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2024 | 471 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2024 | 471 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE “OBJECTS”) ARE THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR WITHIN SANDWELL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) IN PARTICULAR BY BUILDING THE CAPACITY OF ORGANISATIONS WHICH WORK WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFRASTRUCTURE PROVISION. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE, “THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR” MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DEFINED AS FOLLOWS: “CHARITIES” ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. “VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS” ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCL c/o Wesley Methodist Church
High Street
WEST BROMWICH
West Midlands
B70 8ND
- Phone:
- 07745679893
- Website:
-
sandwellchurcheslink.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window