Financial history LEIGH PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE (WESTBURY)

Charity number: 1164413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £95.20k £113.36k £133.70k £120.59k £109.70k
Total expenditure £95.30k £117.17k £147.92k £121.98k £115.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.53k £14.50k N/A N/A N/A