Trustees NANTWICH AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity Number: 507131

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN PARKIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Stuart Austin | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Melvin Johnson | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sophie Large | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Tim Rees | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Stacey Rutter | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie Ann Owen | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Oliver Lewis | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Richard James Sadler | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
David Stanley Hockenhull | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Richard John Morgan-Wynne | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Judith Gratton | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|||||||
ARTHUR MORAN | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|||||||
Alex Stephen Southern | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID EDWIN WINDSOR | Trustee | 23 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID WILLIAM SHAW | Trustee | 11 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||
KARAN STOCKTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BEATRIX ANNA IDA BONNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CHARLES EDWARD VAUGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GEOFFREY ALLEN CALLWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
NORMAN SEYMOUR BONELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ARTHUR NIGEL BURROWS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ROBERT DARLINGTON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
NIGEL MARK DARLINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN STEWART BROOMHALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CLARE WHITTAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HELEN MARGARET SWEENEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.