Financial history ST CUTHBERT'S SOCIETY JUNIOR COMMON ROOM

Charity number: 1168134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £244.86k £111.96k £231.59k £258.53k £238.84k
Total expenditure £200.07k £153.87k £275.98k £286.27k £210.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A