FRIENDS OF CLARENCE HOLMFIELD AND THORNES (CHAT) PARKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserve and protect the amenities of the Park for the benefit of all users. Encourage maximum use of all parts of the Park by a wide range of public. Encourage high standards of maintenance of the Park and facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 30 March 2016: CIO registration
- FRIENDS OF CHAT PARKS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN JOHN DEIGHTON | Chair | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Giuseppe John Brandi | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Kershaw | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|||||
CHRIS WELCH | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|||||
PETER STOKES | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MEREWYN SAYERS | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ELSE | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN REEVE BA DIP T P | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.61k | £2.03k | £38.98k | £11.45k | £14.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.80k | £3.02k | £5.86k | £14.51k | £15.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £28.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 January 2023 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 January 2023 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 30 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WAKEFIELD AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF CLARENCE HOLMFIELD AND THORNES PARKS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 THORNES ROAD
WAKEFIELD
WF2 8QD
- Phone:
- 01924373014
- Email:
- info@chatparks.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window