GATEWAY (YORK) CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gateway Church meets for worship and teaching at the Gateway Centre. It also runs activities for the local community such as: drop-in cafe for over 65's, parent & toddler groups, an after-school club, community nursing service, debt advice services & the distribution of food from York Foodbank. The Centre also houses the offices of different charities whose work supports the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,421 from 5 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ALAN DAVID GEE | Chair | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Young | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kate Langley | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jean Geraghty | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTY RUTH ALLEN | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CALEB SAMUEL ELLWOOD | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|||||
DAVID CHRISTOPHER DONKIN | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £329.15k | £321.22k | £440.62k | £377.97k | £327.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.87k | £277.15k | £300.83k | £421.88k | £350.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.93k | £4.98k | £8.23k | £3.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 24 FEB 2016 AMENDED ON 06 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS SET OUT IN SCHEDULE 1. (2) TO PROVIDE COMMUNITY FACILITIES IN ACOMB, YORK (OR IN SUCH OTHER LOCATIONS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT) FOR EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (3) TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES WHICH THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GATEWAY CENTRE
FRONT STREET
ACOMB
YORK
YO24 3BZ
- Phone:
- 01904781983
- Email:
- office@gatewaychurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window