Financial history MAECYMRU MERCHED A'R EGLWYS

Charity Number: 1165832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £759 £630 £837 £405 £420
Total expenditure £101 £0 £590 £365 £519
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A