Trustees KING'S COLLEGE HOSPITAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1165593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shira Danielle Schnitzer Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Katharine Victoria Taylor Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Jane Bailey Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
Stephen Mark Peel Trustee 19 September 2023
INFINITY BOAT CLUB
Recently registered
Bernadette Thompson Trustee 19 September 2023
None on record
James Bedford Downing Trustee 19 September 2023
None on record
Adrian Williams Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record
Florence Akende Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record
Ian George McKetty Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
GILLIAN MUNRO BURGESS Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Professor Jonathan Cohen Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record