CITY OF COVENTRY MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The City of Coventry Male Voice Choir, promote the practice and enjoyment of Choral Singing through rehearsal and the presentation of public concerts. They operate in the Coventry and Warwickshire area. It's objective is to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music for social welfare and the improvement of conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Coventry City
Governance
- 09 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rodney Ricketts | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Shiers | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mike Purslove | Trustee | 08 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Patricia Russell | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID HOWLIN | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.60k | £2.40k | £3.65k | £6.59k | £5.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.35k | £5.60k | £4.52k | £8.00k | £4.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED ON 25 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; TO PROVIDE FACILITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE PRACTICE OR ENJOYMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND TO MAKE THEM AVAILABLE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 SEBASTIAN CLOSE
COVENTRY
CV3 4DW
- Phone:
- 07946384942
- Email:
- ccmvcsecretary@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window