MUSIC IN FELIXSTOWE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity arranges a series of concerts and performances throughout the year in the Felixstowe area of Suffolk. In 2016 a winter series of musical performances was arranged at the Orwell Hotel on Wednesday lunchtimes, and in the summer a very successful 'Young Musicians' series which gave many young musicians from the area an opportunity to perform in public, either alone or in a group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HATTIE BENNETT | Chair | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Hayley | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Marie Harkin | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Carol Gant | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Maxwell Sharp Reaville | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brian Latchem | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kaye Stone | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMILY JANE BENNETT | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS FRANK REGINALD WARD | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.63k | £12.39k | £25.05k | £30.38k | £42.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.85k | £17.76k | £22.26k | £32.04k | £34.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £600 | £1.50k | £4.50k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO BRING TOP CLASS MUSICIANS TO LOCAL AUDIENCES BY: 1) PROMOTING THE KNOWLEDGE AND ENJOYMENT OF PERFORMANCES OF LIVE MUSIC IN FELIXSTOWE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. OFFERING A WIDE-RANGING PROGRAMME OF CONCERTS AND RECITALS THROUGHOUT THE YEAR, INTRODUCED IN A RELAXED ATMOSPHERE, AND HELD IN EASILY ACCESSIBLE LOCATIONS. 2) ADVANCING THE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN SCHOOLS BY TAKING LIVE INSTRUMENTALISTS INTO SCHOOLS AND ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION 3) ENABLING YOUNG PEOPLE TO HAVE THE CONFIDENCE AND SKILL TO PERFORM MUSIC IN PUBLIC, BY ARRANGING AND PROMOTING SPECIAL OCCASIONS ON WHICH THEY CAN PERFORM. 4) BRINGING LIVE MUSIC INTO CARE HOMES AND SIMILAR ESTABLISHMENTS WHERE ACCESS TO LIVE MUSIC IS DIFFICULT FOR RESIDENTS AND ENCOURAGE PARTICIPATION IN THE EXPERIENCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARSH COTTAGE
THE FERRY
FELIXSTOWE
IP11 9RZ
- Phone:
- 01394 670633
- Email:
- musicinfelixstowe@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window