THE HARRY SUNLEY MEMORIAL PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Refurbishing the Tantara Gatehouse of Kenilworth Abbey to allow access to scholars and to the general public. Raising funds to enable the necessary works to be carried out.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 15 April 2016: CIO registration
- HSMP (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNA MARY ILLINGWORTH | Chair | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
MAGARET KANE | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
MERVYN JOHN KIMBERLEY | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|||||
MARILYN JOYCE BATES | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Leonard Oakley | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gillard | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.33k | £3.76k | £1.34k | £2.61k | £2.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £828 | £2.83k | £3.28k | £672 | £672 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: - THE PRESERVATION, ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVED ACCESS TO THE EXISTING BUILDINGS AND THE RUINS WHICH FORM PART OF THE HISTORIC "TANTARA" GATEHOUSE OF THE ABBEY OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, KENILWORTH; AND - THE PRESERVATION AND DISPLAY OF ARTEFACTS OF THE KENILWORTH ABBEY SITE NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREE TOPS
21 MANOR ROAD
KENILWORTH
CV8 2GJ
- Phone:
- 01926511183
- Email:
- j.m.i@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window