Financial history THE TENNIS & RACKETS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1167866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £421.50k £327.70k £327.70k £583.80k £548.10k
Total expenditure £443.50k £251.30k £251.30k £588.00k £571.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £190.10k £122.70k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £68.90k £44.90k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £262.40k £319.10k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £62.40k £61.40k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £484.20k £477.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £9.80k £11.50k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £11.50k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £94.00k £82.60k