Accounts and annual returns ANNIE AMELIA NAYLOR CHARITY

Charity number: 507471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required