Financial history FARINGTON MOSS ST. PAUL'S EXTENDED PROVISION

Charity number: 1168087
Charity reporting is up to date (262 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £65.57k £45.74k £46.65k £58.40k £70.43k
Total expenditure £53.83k £53.46k £45.08k £64.39k £67.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A