STRONGBACK PRODUCTIONS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PURPOSE OF STRONGBACK PRODUCTIONS IS TO PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING, APPRECIATION, SUPPORT AND VALIDATION OF THE DIVERSITY OF MODERN BRITAIN THROUGH DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING, AND MUSIC AND CROSS ART FORMS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £31,084 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN BENN BSC DESIGN | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Manning | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Gardiner | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|||||
EVA de Blocq Van Kuffeler | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.50k | £21.55k | £157 | £18.01k | £62.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.23k | £31.33k | £20.38k | £20.19k | £54.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.35k | £20.96k | N/A | N/A | £31.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 NOV 2013
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF STRONGBACK PRODUCTIONS IS TO PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING APPRECIATION, SUPPORT AND VALIDATION OF THE DIVERSITY OF MODERN BRITAIN THROUGH DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND CROSS ART FORMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Space
International House
6th Floor
Canterbury Crescent
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07718746015
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window