Financial history DART CENTRE EUROPE LIMITED

Charity number: 1172731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £102.28k £166.28k £204.75k £261.50k £211.94k
Total expenditure £127.24k £102.18k £141.80k £211.78k £241.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.94k N/A N/A N/A N/A