NEWWAY PROJECT

Charity number: 1165966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

NEWway Project was set up in 2013 in order to support the rising numbers of homeless people in the London Borough of Newham. Our team works alongside specialist support agencies, local churches and hundreds of local volunteers to provide three core services: NEWdawn - a winter night shelter, NEWday - year round daytime support services, and NEWlife - gardening workshops for local rough sleepers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £439,733
Total expenditure: £389,073

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Newham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 March 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MATTHEW PORTER Chair 09 March 2016
None on record
Agnieszka Pogorzelec Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Timothy Wood Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
DAVE CHESNEY Trustee 09 March 2016
THE FELSTED SCHOOL MISSION
Received: On time
NEWHAM YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Received: 46 days late
TRANSFORM NEWHAM
Received: On time
THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £226.73k £386.70k £550.56k £254.89k £439.73k
Total expenditure £194.41k £329.43k £467.97k £285.10k £389.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £91.32k N/A £151.22k £15.00k £73.41k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £312.64k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £237.92k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £467.97k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £4.99k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 05 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 15 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 17 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bonny Downs Baptist Church
Darwell Close
LONDON
E6 6BT
Phone:
07490983777