Financial history SHROPSHIRE HILLS AONB TRUST

Charity number: 1168432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.57k £19.48k £13.21k £11.84k £13.56k
Total expenditure £13.55k £13.87k £7.83k £20.10k £16.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A