SHROPSHIRE HILLS AONB TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objectives are the conservation and enhancement of the natural beauty, landscape, wildlife and historic value of the Shropshire Hills Area of Outstanding Natural Beauty. It awards grants to projects carried out by individuals and groups whose activities support these objectives. It is also concerned to advance understanding and awareness of the environmental value of the AONB.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 26 July 2016: CIO registration
- Shropshire Hills Landscape Trust (Working name)
- Shropshire Hills Trust (Working name)
- SHROPSHIRE HILLS AONB CONSERVATION FUND (Previous name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ANTHONY MORGAN | Chair | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Stephany Cockett | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Janet Mary Cobb | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|||||
GEORGE CHANCELLOR | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Charles Philip Edwards | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Alexander Willcox | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP HOLDEN | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.57k | £19.48k | £13.21k | £11.84k | £13.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.55k | £13.87k | £7.83k | £20.10k | £16.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE NATURAL BEAUTY, LANDSCAPE, WILDLIFE AND HISTORIC VALUE OF THE SHROPSHIRE HILLS AREA OF OUTSTANDING NATURAL BEAUTY (AONB), FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND AROUND THE AONB, IN THE NATURAL BEAUTY, LANDSCAPE, WILDLIFE AND HISTORIC VALUE OF THE SHROPSHIRE HILLS AONB, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shropshire Hills National Landscape
Unit 5
Drovers House
The Auction Yard
CRAVEN ARMS
Shropshi
- Phone:
- 01743 254740
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window