WOODSTOCK YOUTH WORK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Woodstock Youth Work Trust (WYWT) carries out a variety of activities in different venues. This includes a board game group, some small groups, and a monthly youth worship service, as well as work in the local schools and youth club. For more information about any and all of these, please visit our website: www.woodstockyouthworktrust.co.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 July 2016: CIO registration
- WYWT (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Graham Carter | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Katie Jones | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew James Mills | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BAND | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.42k | £16.68k | £26.19k | £16.23k | £26.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.33k | £19.51k | £20.68k | £24.38k | £19.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES, IN SCHOOLS AND GROUPS, AND IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE CHURCHES IN THE AREA OF WOODSTOCK AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Schofield Gardens
WITNEY
Oxfordshire
OX28 1JY
- Phone:
- 01993 779835
- Email:
- alanband@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window