Financial history ROYAL DART YOUTH SAILING TRUST

Charity Number: 1167579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.31k £8.54k £30.04k £35.25k £24.10k
Total expenditure £14.54k £25.82k £25.89k £29.97k £28.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A