THE ROGER GOWER MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Born to Fly looks to support conservation strategies in Kenya and Tanzania through helping key stakeholders gain access to and the trust of communities through helping with education initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
- Tanzania
Governance
- 19 April 2016: CIO registration
- 07 May 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 07 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1186533 TUSK TRUST LIMITED
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.36k | £20.93k | £2.79k | £872 | £753 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £131.28k | £1.59k | £2.16k | £104.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS WILDLIFE IN AFRICA BY PROVIDING PROTECTION FROM POACHING, APPROPRIATE CARE, TREATMENT AND SECURITY IN THE FACE OF POACHING; (B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND THE WORLD AT LARGE, TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF AFRICAN WILDLIFE AFFECTED BY POACHING AND IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AS A RESULT OF POACHING; (C) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF AFRICAN WILDLIFE AFFECTED BY POACHING, SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT AND POOR CIRCUMSTANCES; (D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN COMBATING WILDLIFE POACHING IN AFRICA, MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE, AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY AFRICAN WILDLIFE AFFECTED BY POACHING; AND (E) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window