FIVE RIVERS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A UK based charity helping to advance the education of children and young people in the Panjab region of India
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 05 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JESSIE AMRIT CATHERINE JANE KAUR KHERA | Chair | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOSLIN MENDOZA | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NEAL SINGH KHERA | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTONIA MICHOU | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAYA LOUISE KAUR KHERA | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SEEMA KAUR KHERA | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN JAMES SCHOFIELD | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|||||
SONIA KAUR KHERA | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £550 | £0 | £16.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £882 | £0 | £13.50k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE PANJAB REGION OF INDIA (IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE GURDASPUR AND AMRITSAR DISTRICTS) BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO CHARITIES, OTHER [NOT-FOR-PROFIT] ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS IN ORDER TO HELP TO FUND SCHOOL-LEVEL EDUCATION, POST-SCHOOL SKILLS-BASED TRAINING AND LEARNING AIDS FOR BENEFICIARIES AND TO HELP FAMILIES OF BENEFICIARIES TO CREATE AND SUSTAIN A SUITABLE [HOME] ENVIRONMENT WITHIN WHICH THE BENEFICIARIES CAN LEARN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 WESTBOURNE PARK ROAD
LONDON
W2 5PL
- Phone:
- 07817174977
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window